MO HB173 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-23 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-23 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits limiting the investment of funds by the board of the Missouri Higher Education Savings Program to a specified grouping or list of investment vehicles
Title
Prohibits limiting the investment of funds by the board of the Missouri Higher Education Savings Program to a specified grouping or list of investment vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-23 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-02-23 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-02-16 | Executive Session - No Action Taken | |
2011-02-09 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-01-20 | Referred: Financial Institutions (H) | |
2011-01-12 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-11 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB173&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0173I.htm |