MO HB1729 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-06 - Reported to the House with... (H) - SA 1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-06 - Reported to the House with... (H) - SA 1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Division of Commerce and Industrial Development to support and assist the development of biotechnological enterprises and establish an office in Israel to assist with the promotion of state exports
Title
Requires the Division of Commerce and Industrial Development to support and assist the development of biotechnological enterprises and establish an office in Israel to assist with the promotion of state exports
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-06 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SA 1 |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1 ADOPTED AYES: 30 |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, May 5, 2014, 2:45pm, Pershing Conference Room (Fiscal Oversight) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) - SA 1 adopted |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 30, 2014, 1:15pm, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 9, 2014, Noon or upon Noon recess, Senate Lounge |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government(S) |
2014-03-31 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-03-27 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 120 NOES: 11 |
2014-03-27 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-03-27 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-27 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-26 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2014-03-26 | House | Perfected (H) |
2014-03-26 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2014-03-26 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2014-03-24 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-24 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-24 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-03 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-03-03 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-27 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-18 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2014-02-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-02-05 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |