MO HB1697 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the third week of September as Historically Black College and University Week
Title
Designates the third week of September as Historically Black College and University Week
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-05-01 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-04-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-04-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-28 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Tourism(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-20 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1697&year=2018&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/5314H.01I.pdf |