MO HB1696 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-14 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-14 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Missouri Commission for the Deaf and Hard of Hearing to provide grants to organizations that provide services to deaf-blind persons
Title
Requires the Missouri Commission for the Deaf and Hard of Hearing to provide grants to organizations that provide services to deaf-blind persons
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-12 - House - House: HB 1696 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 142 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - House: HB 1696 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 142 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House: HB 1696 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 145 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - House: HB 1696 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 142 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House: HB 1696 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 145 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-14 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2016-06-14 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2016-05-25 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2016-05-12 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 142 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-12 | House | House Adopts (H) - SCS AYES: 142 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-12 | House | Taken Up |
2016-05-12 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2016-05-12 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-05-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-05-11 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 30 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Taken Up |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - voted do pass |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 27, 2016, 2:00pm, SCR 1 |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2016-04-21 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 5, 2016, 8:15am, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Seniors, Families, and Children(S) |
2016-03-07 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-03-07 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 145 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-07 | House | Taken Up |
2016-03-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-07 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-03-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-03-03 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2016-03-02 | House | Perfected (H) |
2016-03-02 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2016-03-02 | House | Taken Up |
2016-02-17 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-11 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Social Services(H) |
2016-02-03 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-02 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-14 | House | Referred: Children and Families(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-09 | House | Prefiled (H) |