MO HB169 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-01 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-01 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Missouri Entertainment Industry Investment Act and the Missouri Entertainment Industry Postproduction Investment Act.
Title
Establishes the Missouri Entertainment Industry Investment Act and the Missouri Entertainment Industry Postproduction Investment Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Seitz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-01 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred: Economic Development(H) |
2023-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2022-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |