MO HB1675 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-16 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies medical endorsement requirements for school bus drivers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies medical endorsement requirements for school bus drivers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-21 - House - House: HB 1675 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 135 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2018-05-15SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2018-04-17SenateReturned to Committee of Origin (S) - Education
2018-04-17SenateRemoved from Consent Calendar (S)
2018-04-11SenateReported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar (S)
2018-04-11SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass Consent
2018-04-10SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 11, 2018, 8:30am, Bingham Conference Room
2018-04-10SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2018-04-05SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 10, 2018, 1:00pm, SCR 1
2018-03-08SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Education(S)
2018-02-21HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2018-02-21HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 135 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-21HouseTaken Up
2018-02-14HousePerfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
2018-02-06HouseReported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-06HouseVoted Do Pass - Consent (H)
2018-02-06HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-29HouseReferred: Consent and House Procedure(H)
2018-01-29HouseReported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-01-29HouseVoted Do Pass - Consent (H)
2018-01-29HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-24HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-17HouseReferred: Transportation(H)
2018-01-04HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-03HouseRead First Time (H)
2017-12-19HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback