MO HB1663 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - Returned to Committee of Origin (S) - Education
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - Returned to Committee of Origin (S) - Education
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allows school districts to establish comprehensive school counseling programs for students attending school in the district
Title
Allows school districts to establish comprehensive school counseling programs for students attending school in the district
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - House - House: HB 1663 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Senate | Returned to Committee of Origin (S) - Education |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Removed from Consent Calendar (S) |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar (S) |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass Consent |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 11, 2018, 8:30am, Bingham Conference Room |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 10, 2018, 1:00pm, SCR 1 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Education(S) |
2018-02-21 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-02-21 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 138 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-21 | House | Taken Up |
2018-02-14 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2018-02-06 | House | Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-06 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2018-02-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-25 | House | Referred: Consent and House Procedure(H) |
2018-01-25 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-01-24 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-22 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-17 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-18 | House | Prefiled (H) |