MO HB1660 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-16 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-16 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies and establishes provisions relating to the prevention of child abductions
Title
Modifies and establishes provisions relating to the prevention of child abductions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | House | Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2024-05-01 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-04-15 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-04-15 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-04-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-04-11 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2024-04-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-04-10 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-04-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-01-31 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-01-05 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |