MO HB1653 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions of law relating to certain incentives offered by manufacturers and retailers of intoxicating liquor
Title
Modifies provisions of law relating to certain incentives offered by manufacturers and retailers of intoxicating liquor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - House - House: HB 1653 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 103 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, March 14, 2018, 8:00am, SCR 1 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Government Reform(S) |
2018-02-12 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-02-12 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 103 NOES: 41 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-12 | House | Taken Up |
2018-02-07 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2018-02-07 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2018-02-07 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To - relating to intoxicating liquor |
2018-02-07 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2018-01-30 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 1 |
2018-01-29 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-01-29 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-18 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-01-18 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-01-16 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-01-16 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-16 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-18 | House | Prefiled (H) |