MO HB1653 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-06 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-06 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the crime of tampering with farm equipment
Title
Creates the crime of tampering with farm equipment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-04-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-25 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Judiciary(H) |
2016-02-25 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-24 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred: Civil and Criminal Proceedings(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-07 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1653&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB1653I.PDF |