MO HB1645 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to actions for damages due to exposure to asbestos
Title
Modifies provisions relating to actions for damages due to exposure to asbestos
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - House - House: HB 1645 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 104 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House: HB 1645 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: HB 1645 (HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 97 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: HB 1645 (*HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 59 N: 88 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2018-03-06 - House - House: HB 1645 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 104 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House: HB 1645 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: HB 1645 (HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 97 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: HB 1645 (*HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 59 N: 88 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2018-03-06 - House - House: HB 1645 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 104 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, March 28, 2018, 8:00am, SCR 1 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Government Reform(S) |
2018-03-08 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-03-08 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 96 NOES: 48 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-08 | House | Taken Up |
2018-03-06 | House | Perfected (H) |
2018-03-06 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2018-03-06 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2018-03-06 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2018-02-20 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-14 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-30 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-01-30 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-01-29 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-01-29 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-22 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2018-01-22 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2018-01-16 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Litigation Reform(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-18 | House | Prefiled (H) |