MO HB1631 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-07 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-07 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires a person to submit a specified form of photo identification in order to vote in a public election with specified exemptions
Title
Requires a person to submit a specified form of photo identification in order to vote in a public election with specified exemptions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - House - House: HB 1631 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 103 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House: HB 1631 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 112 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House: HB 1631 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 112 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - HB 1631 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 114 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - HB 1631 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 111 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - HB 1631 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 113 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - HB 1631 (*HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 41 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2016-01-20 - House - HB 1631 (HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 107 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - HB 1631 (*HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 49 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2016-01-20 - House - HB 1631 (HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 102 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House: HB 1631 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 112 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House: HB 1631 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 112 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - HB 1631 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 114 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - HB 1631 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 111 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - HB 1631 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 113 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - HB 1631 (*HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 41 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2016-01-20 - House - HB 1631 (HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 107 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - HB 1631 (*HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 49 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2016-01-20 - House - HB 1631 (HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 102 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-07 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2016-07-07 | House | Vetoed by Governor (G) |
2016-05-25 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2016-05-05 | House | House Message (H) |
2016-05-04 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 112 NOES: 38 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-04 | House | House Adopts (H) - SS#2 for SCS for HB 1631 as amended AYES: 112 NOES: 40 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-04 | House | Taken Up |
2016-05-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2016-05-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-05-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-05-03 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS#2 as amended |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1 AYES: 24 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Tuesday, May 3, 2016, 12:30pm, Bingham Conference Room |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2016-05-02 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) - SA 1 to SS#2 adopted |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2016-05-02 | Senate | SS Withdrawn (S) |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar - SS for SCS and SA 2, pending |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar - SS for SCS and SA 1 pending |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar - SS for SCS and SA 1 pending |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, February 1, 2016, 2:00pm, Senate Lounge |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections(S) |
2016-01-25 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-01-21 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 114 NOES: 39 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-01-21 | House | Taken Up |
2016-01-21 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-01-21 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-01-21 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-20 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2016-01-20 | House | Perfected (H) |
2016-01-20 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2016-01-20 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2016-01-20 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2016-01-14 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-01-14 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-01-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments(H) |
2016-01-12 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-01-12 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-01-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-12 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Referred: Elections(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |