MO HB1583 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits the inspection of certain grounds or facilities in Missouri to enforce the laws of a state other than Missouri

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits the inspection of certain grounds or facilities in Missouri to enforce the laws of a state other than Missouri

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-25HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2020-02-20HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-02-20HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-02-13HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2020-02-13HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 19 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0
2020-02-12HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2020-02-12HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-02-05HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2020-01-16HouseReferred: Agriculture Policy(H)
2020-01-09HouseRead Second Time (H)
2020-01-08HouseRead First Time (H)
2019-12-03HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback