MO HB1574 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-14 - Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-14 - Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to advanced practice registered nurses in collaborative practice arrangements
Title
Modifies provisions relating to advanced practice registered nurses in collaborative practice arrangements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - House - House: HB 1574 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 144 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House: HB 1574 (HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 92 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House: HB 1574 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 89 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 41) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House: HB 1574 (HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 92 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House: HB 1574 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 89 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 41) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-14 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 30, 2018, 2:00pm, SCR 1 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Professional Registration(S) |
2018-04-05 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-04-05 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 144 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-04-05 | House | Taken Up |
2018-03-28 | House | Perfected (H) - HA 1, HA 2 adopted |
2018-03-28 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2018-03-28 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2018-03-28 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2018-03-06 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-27 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2018-02-27 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-21 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-21 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-14 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-11 | House | Prefiled (H) |