MO HB1562 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the crime of sexual trafficking to include advertising a child participating in a commercial sexual act
Title
Expands the crime of sexual trafficking to include advertising a child participating in a commercial sexual act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-10 - House - House: HB 1562 (SA4, SA5, & SA6) HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - House: HB 1562 (SA4, SA5, & SA6) HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 152 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House: HB 1562 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 153 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - House: HB 1562 (SA4, SA5, & SA6) HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 152 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House: HB 1562 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 153 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-22 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2016-06-22 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2016-05-25 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2016-05-17 | House | House Message (H) |
2016-05-10 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 154 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1 |
2016-05-10 | House | House Concurs (H) - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3, SA 4, SA 5 and SA 6 AYES: 152 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1 |
2016-05-10 | House | Taken Up |
2016-04-25 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2016-04-25 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-04-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-04-20 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3, SA 4, SA 5, and SA 6 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3, SA 4, SA 5, and SA 6 adopted AYES: 28 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Taken Up |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, March 1, 2016, 8:15 a.m., Senate Committee Room 1 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Seniors, Families, and Children(S) |
2016-02-04 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-02-04 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 153 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-04 | House | Taken Up |
2016-02-02 | House | Perfected (H) |
2016-02-02 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2016-02-02 | House | Taken Up |
2016-01-28 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-01-27 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-01-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-21 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Judiciary(H) |
2016-01-21 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-01-20 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-01-20 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-20 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred: Civil and Criminal Proceedings(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |