MO HB1560 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Government Accountability Committee
Hearing: May 7 @ 9:00 am in House Hearing Room 1 (Executive Session)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Government Accountability Committee
Hearing: May 7 @ 9:00 am in House Hearing Room 1 (Executive Session)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits temporary assistance for needy families (TANF) benefit cards from being used at ATMs or to access cash, and limits the items that may be purchased with TANF benefits
Title
Prohibits temporary assistance for needy families (TANF) benefit cards from being used at ATMs or to access cash, and limits the items that may be purchased with TANF benefits
Sponsors
Rep. Bennie Cook [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-02-01 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Government Accountability(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |