MO HB1554 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-09 - Hearing Cancelled (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Allows persons with certain serious medical conditions to use medical cannabis

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows persons with certain serious medical conditions to use medical cannabis

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - House - House: HB 1554 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 106 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House: HB 1554 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 112 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House: HB 1554 (HA 1 HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 101 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House: HB 1554 (*HA 1 HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 59 N: 89 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - House - House: HB 1554 (HA 1 HSA 1 HA 3) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 101 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House: HB 1554 (*HA 1 HSA 1 HA 3) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 127 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House: HB 1554 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 99 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House: HB 1554 (HSA 1 HA 3, A.A.) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 105 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-09SenateHearing Cancelled (S)
2018-05-08SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Health and Pensions(S)
2018-05-01HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2018-05-01HouseThird Read and Passed with Amendments (H) - HPA 1 adopted AYES: 112 NOES: 44 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-01HouseTaken Up
2018-05-01HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-01HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-05-01HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-04-30HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2018-04-24HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2018-04-23HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 2, HA 1 to HSA 1 for HA 3, HSA 1 for HA 3 as amended adopted
2018-04-23HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2018-04-23HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2018-04-23HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2018-04-09HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2018-04-09HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-04-09HouseBill Reconsidered (H)
2018-04-09HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-04-04HouseMotion to Do Pass Failed (H)
2018-04-04HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-15HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2018-02-15HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-13HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-13HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-06HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-24HouseReferred: General Laws(H)
2018-01-04HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-03HouseRead First Time (H)
2017-12-07HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1554&year=2018&code=R
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/5285H.01I.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/5285H.04C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/5285H.04P.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/5285H.04D.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/059.006.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/059.007.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/059.005.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/059.004.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/059.003.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/059.002.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/064.009.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/064.008.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback