MO HB1549 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-14 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-14 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the state's No-call List by allowing a person to place his or her cell phone number on the list and prohibiting telemarketers from sending specified communications
Title
Changes the laws regarding the state's No-call List by allowing a person to place his or her cell phone number on the list and prohibiting telemarketers from sending specified communications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-14 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2012-06-14 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2012-05-30 | Delivered to Governor | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2012-05-15 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 34 NAYS: 00 | |
2012-05-10 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-05-10 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2012-05-01 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-04-26 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - TUESDAY, MAY 1, 2012 1:30 P.M., SENATE LOUNGE | |
2012-04-19 | Second Read and Referred: Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy, and the Environment (S) | |
2012-04-12 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-04-12 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 147 NOES: 000 | |
2012-04-11 | Perfected (H) | |
2012-04-11 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-23 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-02-23 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-21 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-21 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-14 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-02 | Referred: General Laws (H) | |
2012-01-30 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-26 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |