MO HB1535 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - Referred: General Laws(H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - Referred: General Laws(H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds public libraries to the list of places CCW permit holders are not authorized to carry concealed weapons.
Title
Adds public libraries to the list of places CCW permit holders are not authorized to carry concealed weapons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1535&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/3881H.01I.pdf |