MO HB1533 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires licensed chiropractors to be reimbursed under the MO HealthNet Program for providing services currently covered and within the scope of chiropractic practice
Title
Requires licensed chiropractors to be reimbursed under the MO HealthNet Program for providing services currently covered and within the scope of chiropractic practice
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-06 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-06 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-21 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-01 | Referred: Health Insurance (H) | |
2012-01-30 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-26 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1533&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1533I.htm |