MO HB1524 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows pharmaceutical companies to communicate off-label treatment uses to health care professionals
Title
Allows pharmaceutical companies to communicate off-label treatment uses to health care professionals
Sponsors
Rep. James Neely [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-04-25 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-04-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-04-17 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2018-04-17 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-04-11 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-04-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-04-04 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred: Health and Mental Health Policy(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-06 | House | Prefiled (H) |