MO HB1520 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-13 - Referred: Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness(H)
Pending: House Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-13 - Referred: Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness(H)
Pending: House Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates provisions relating to racial profiling, searches and seizures, and traffic stops from law enforcement
Title
Creates provisions relating to racial profiling, searches and seizures, and traffic stops from law enforcement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-13 | House | Referred: Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1520&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB1520I.PDF |