MO HB1503 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-26 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Crime Prevention And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the crimes of assault of a utility worker or an employee of a mass transit system in the first, second, and third degrees

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the crimes of assault of a utility worker or an employee of a mass transit system in the first, second, and third degrees

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-26 Public Hearing Completed (H)
2012-02-08 Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety (H)
2012-01-26 Read Second Time (H)
2012-01-25 Introduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback