MO HB1495 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Changes the laws regarding liability for reporting insurance fraud

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes the laws regarding liability for reporting insurance fraud

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-07-12 Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
2012-07-12 Approved by Governor (G)
2012-05-30 Delivered to Governor
2012-05-30 Signed by President Pro Tem (S)
2012-05-30 Signed by House Speaker(H)
2012-05-16 Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 144 NOES: 3
2012-05-16 House Concurs (H) - SCS ADOPTED AYES: 144 NOES: 4
2012-04-30 Reported to the House with... (S) - SCS
2012-04-30 Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 32 NAYS: 0
2012-04-30 SCS Adopted (S)
2012-04-19 SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2012-04-10 Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS
2012-04-03 Public Hearing Held (S)
2012-03-29 Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - TUESDAY, APRIL 3, 2012, 12:00PM,SCR 1
2012-03-22 Second Read and Referred: Small Business, Insurance, and Industry (S)
2012-03-08 Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2012-03-08 Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 145 NOES: 0
2012-03-06 Perfected (H)
2012-03-06 HCS Adopted (H)
2012-02-23 Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
2012-02-23 Rules - Voted Do Pass (H)
2012-02-23 Rules - Executive Session Completed (H)
2012-02-14 Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H)
2012-02-14 HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
2012-02-13 HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2012-02-13 Executive Session Completed (H)
2012-02-14 Public Hearing Completed (H)
2012-02-02 Referred: Insurance Policy (H)
2012-01-26 Read Second Time (H)
2012-01-25 Introduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback