MO HB149 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-17 - Referred: Transportation(H)
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-17 - Referred: Transportation(H)
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Revenue to include in the Missouri Driver Guide educational material on vehicular stops and searches by law enforcement.
Title
Requires the Department of Revenue to include in the Missouri Driver Guide educational material on vehicular stops and searches by law enforcement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB149&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0465H.01I.pdf |