MO HB1484 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-19 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Ways And Means And Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-19 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Ways And Means And Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Paperless Documents and Forms Act which authorizes the Department of Revenue to use technology to allow the filing of certain forms and the sending of certain notifications
Title
Establishes the Paperless Documents and Forms Act which authorizes the Department of Revenue to use technology to allow the filing of certain forms and the sending of certain notifications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-19 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-04-17 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - THURSDAY, APRIL 19, 8:30AM, SCR 1 | |
2012-04-05 | Second Read and Referred: Ways and Means (S) | |
2012-03-28 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-03-28 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 142 NOES: 2 | |
2012-03-27 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-28 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-02-28 | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2012-02-28 | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-02-28 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-14 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-08 | Referred: Transportation Funding and Public Institutions (H) | |
2012-01-25 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-24 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |