MO HB1476 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-14 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Crime Prevention And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-14 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Crime Prevention And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to ignition interlock device requirements for certain intoxication-related traffic offenses
Title
Modifies provisions relating to ignition interlock device requirements for certain intoxication-related traffic offenses
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Sharp [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-02-01 | House | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |