MO HB1468 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-10 - SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-10 - SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allows any person to carry a concealed firearm anywhere that isn't expressly prohibited by law
Title
Allows any person to carry a concealed firearm anywhere that isn't expressly prohibited by law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-26 - House - House: HB 1468 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 103 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - House: HB 1468 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 112 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House: HB 1468 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 101 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House: HB 1468 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 109 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House: HB 1468 (HA 1 HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 110 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House: HB 1468 (HA 1 HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 116 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - House: HB 1468 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 112 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House: HB 1468 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 101 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House: HB 1468 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 109 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House: HB 1468 (HA 1 HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 110 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House: HB 1468 (HA 1 HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 116 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, May 4, 2016, 8:15am, SCR 1 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S) |
2016-04-26 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-04-26 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 112 NOES: 37 PRESENT: 1 |
2016-04-26 | House | Taken Up |
2016-04-20 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HSA 1 for HA 3, HA 4, and HA 5 adopted AYES: 109 NOES: 36 PRESENT: 2 |
2016-04-20 | House | Taken Up |
2016-04-13 | House | Laid Over (H) - HA 1 ro HA 2 adopted, HA 2 as amended pending |
2016-04-13 | House | Taken Up |
2016-04-13 | House | Laid Over (H) - HA 1 adopted, HA 2 pending |
2016-04-13 | House | Taken Up |
2016-03-29 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-16 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-03-16 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-03-08 | House | Referred: Select Committee on General Laws(H) |
2016-03-08 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-07 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-03-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-29 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-20 | House | Referred: Emerging Issues(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |