MO HB1467 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to Public Employee Retirement Systems.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to Public Employee Retirement Systems.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-07 - House - House: HB 1467 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - House: HB 1467 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: HB 1467 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 152 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-13HouseDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2020-07-13HouseApproved by Governor (G)
2020-05-27HouseDelivered to Governor
2020-05-27HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2020-05-27HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2020-05-07HouseHouse Message (H)
2020-05-07HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 145 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-07HouseHouse Adopts (H) - SS as amended AYES: 148 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-07HouseTaken Up
2020-05-06HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-06HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-05-06HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-05-04HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2020-05-04SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SS as amended
2020-05-04SenateThird Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1 adopted AYES: 30 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-04SenateSS Adopted (S)
2020-05-04SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2020-05-04SenateTaken Up for Third Reading (S)
2020-04-30SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2020-04-29SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2020-04-29SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (S)
2020-04-29SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2020-04-29SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2020-04-29SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Fiscal Oversight pending referral - 12:00 pm, Wednesday, April 29, 2020, Room 117
2020-04-25SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - 10:30 a.m. or upon recess, Wednesday, April 29, 2020, Senate Chamber
2020-02-20SenateSecond read and referred: Health and Pensions(S)
2020-02-03HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2020-02-03HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 152 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 1
2020-02-03HouseTaken Up
2020-01-29HousePerfected (H)
2020-01-29HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2020-01-29HouseTaken Up
2020-01-27HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-01-27HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-01-27HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-01-22HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2020-01-22HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-01-21HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-01-21HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-01-14HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2020-01-09HouseReferred: Pensions(H)
2020-01-09HouseRead Second Time (H)
2020-01-08HouseRead First Time (H)
2019-12-02HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback