MO HB1449 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adds stationary vehicles owned by a public utility displaying lighted amber or amber and white lights to the "move over law" list
Title
Adds stationary vehicles owned by a public utility displaying lighted amber or amber and white lights to the "move over law" list
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - House - House: HB 1449 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 149 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: HB 1449 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 148 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: HB 1449 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 148 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 6, 2016, 8:15am, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S) |
2016-02-29 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-02-29 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 149 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-29 | House | Taken Up |
2016-02-24 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted AYES: 148 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-24 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2016-02-24 | House | Taken Up |
2016-02-11 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-11 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments(H) |
2016-02-02 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-01 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-25 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred: Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |