MO HB1426 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-21 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Professional Registration And Licensing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-21 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Professional Registration And Licensing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates provisions to the licensure of radiologic imaging and radiation therapy personnel
Title
Creates provisions to the licensure of radiologic imaging and radiation therapy personnel
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Porter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-04-14 | House | Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing(H) |
2021-03-02 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-03-01 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |