MO HB1425 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-17 - Referred: General Laws(H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-17 - Referred: General Laws(H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases liability requirements for property damage in regards to motor vehicle insurance policies
Title
Increases liability requirements for property damage in regards to motor vehicle insurance policies
Sponsors
Rep. Mike McGirl [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-17 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |