MO HB1417 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred: Senior Citizen Advocacy (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred: Senior Citizen Advocacy (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands eligibility for the Missouri Rx Plan to include retired Missouri residents 65 years of age or older with annual incomes of up to $25,000 for individuals and of up to $50,000 for married couples
Title
Expands eligibility for the Missouri Rx Plan to include retired Missouri residents 65 years of age or older with annual incomes of up to $25,000 for individuals and of up to $50,000 for married couples
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | Referred: Senior Citizen Advocacy (H) | |
2010-01-07 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-06 | Read First Time (H) | |
2009-12-17 | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1417&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB1417I.htm |