MO HB1413 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires authorization for certain labor unions to use dues and fees to make political contributions and requires consent for withholding earnings from paychecks

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires authorization for certain labor unions to use dues and fees to make political contributions and requires consent for withholding earnings from paychecks

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - House - House: HB 1413 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 101 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House: HB 1413 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 87 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House: HB 1413 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 88 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: HB 1413 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 55 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: HB 1413 (*HA 3) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 101 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: HB 1413 (*HA 3) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 63 N: 85 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-01HouseDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2018-06-01HouseApproved by Governor (G)
2018-05-30HouseDelivered to Governor
2018-05-30HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2018-05-30HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2018-05-30HouseConstitutional Objection Filed (H)
2018-05-17HouseHouse Message (H)
2018-05-17HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 87 NOES: 62 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-17HouseHouse Adopts (H) - SS#2 as amended AYES: 88 NOES: 59 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-17HouseTaken Up
2018-05-17HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-17HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-05-17HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-05-17HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2018-05-17SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SS#2 as amended
2018-05-16SenateThird Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3, SA 4 AYES: 21 NOES: 11 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-16SenateSS Adopted (S)
2018-05-16SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2018-05-16SenateSS Withdrawn (S)
2018-05-16SenateTaken Up
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar - SA 1 to SS for SCS pending
2018-04-24SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2018-04-24SenateTaken Up
2018-03-29SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2018-03-15SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2018-03-15SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - voted do pass
2018-03-15SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2018-03-13SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursdy, March 15, 2018, 9:30am, Bingham Conference Room
2018-03-12SenateReferred: Senate Fiscal Oversight(S)
2018-03-08SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2018-02-27SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, February 28, 2018, 12:00pm, SCR 1
2018-02-21SenateSecond read and referred: Senate General Laws(S)
2018-02-12HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2018-02-12HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 91 NOES: 55 PRESENT: 1
2018-02-12HouseTaken Up
2018-02-07HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 4 adopted
2018-02-07HouseTaken Up
2018-02-07HouseLaid Over (H)
2018-02-07HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2018-02-07HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2018-02-01HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 1
2018-01-31HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-01-31HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-23HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2018-01-23HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2018-01-23HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-01-23HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-17HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-04HouseReferred: Economic Development(H)
2018-01-04HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-03HouseRead First Time (H)
2017-12-01HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1413&year=2018&code=R
Texthttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4637H.01I.pdf
Texthttps://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4637H.01P.pdf
Texthttps://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4637S.02C.pdf
Texthttps://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4637S.14F.pdf
Texthttps://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4637S.14T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/020.005.pdf
Roll Callhttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/020.004.pdf
Roll Callhttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/022.004.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/Journals/RDay7205162134-2300.pdf#2291
Roll Callhttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/076.025.pdf
Roll Callhttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/076.026.pdf
Roll Callhttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/076.024.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback