MO HB1407 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-20 - Referred: Workforce Standards and Development(H)
Pending: House Workforce Standards and Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-20 - Referred: Workforce Standards and Development(H)
Pending: House Workforce Standards and Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that a person cannot be required to become or refrain from becoming a member of or paying dues to a labor organization as a condition or continuation of employment
Title
Specifies that a person cannot be required to become or refrain from becoming a member of or paying dues to a labor organization as a condition or continuation of employment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-20 | House | Referred: Workforce Standards and Development(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1407&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB1407I.PDF |