MO HB1388 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Moves Division 12 of the 16th Judicial Circuit from Kansas City to the City of Independence
Title
Moves Division 12 of the 16th Judicial Circuit from Kansas City to the City of Independence
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-15 - House - House: HB 1388 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 143 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar (S) |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 12, 2016, 12:00pm, Senate Lounge |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S) |
2016-03-16 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-03-15 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 143 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-15 | House | Taken Up |
2016-03-07 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2016-02-18 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-17 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2016-02-17 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-04 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Rules(H) |
2016-02-04 | House | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-03 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2016-02-03 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-27 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred: Civil and Criminal Proceedings(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |