MO HB1383 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-16 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-16 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding information that must be made available on the Missouri Accountability Portal
Title
Changes the laws regarding information that must be made available on the Missouri Accountability Portal
Sponsors
Rep. Stanley Cox [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-05-10 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-05-10 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2012-05-10 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-05-07 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, MAY 9, UPON AFTERNOON RECESS SCR 1 | |
2012-04-19 | Second Read and Referred: General Laws (S) | |
2012-04-12 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-04-12 | Emergency Clause Defeated (H) - AYES: 103 NOES: 047 | |
2012-04-12 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 126 NOES: 023 | |
2012-04-11 | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2 ADOPTED | |
2012-04-11 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2012-03-29 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-29 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-29 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-19 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-03-19 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-05 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-05 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-13 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-01 | Refer: Spec Stand Com Government Oversight & Accountability | |
2012-01-23 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-19 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |