MO HB1376 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-05 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-05 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding secured transactions under the Uniform Commercial Code
Title
Changes the laws regarding secured transactions under the Uniform Commercial Code
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-05 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 29 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar (S) |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass Consent |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 7, 2014, 1:30pm, Senate Lounge |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections(S) |
2014-02-26 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-02-26 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 150 |
2014-02-26 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-02-24 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2014-02-13 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-02-13 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-02-13 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-02-05 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) |
2014-02-05 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-02-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-01-29 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-22 | House | Referred: Financial Institutions(H) |
2014-01-15 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-14 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |