MO HB1375 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-13 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-13 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the development of a brochure regarding human papillomavirus and allows a physician to use expedited partner therapy by dispensing medications to certain persons who are not patients
Title
Requires the development of a brochure regarding human papillomavirus and allows a physician to use expedited partner therapy by dispensing medications to certain persons who are not patients
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-13 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2010-07-13 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2010-05-25 | Delivered to Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2010-05-14 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 120 NOES: 33 | |
2010-05-14 | House Concurs (H) - SCS ADOPTED AYES: 118 NOES: 33 | |
2010-05-11 | Reported to the House with... (S) - SCS | |
2010-05-11 | Third Read and Passed (S) - YEAS: 26 NAYS: 7 | |
2010-05-11 | SCS Adopted (S) | |
2010-05-11 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2010-05-04 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2010-04-28 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2010-04-20 | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS | |
2010-04-13 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2010-03-31 | Second Read and Referred: Health, Mental Health, Seniors, and Familiest (S) | |
2010-03-30 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2010-03-29 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 119 NOES: 32 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-03-24 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | |
2010-03-17 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2010-03-16 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2010-03-16 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-04 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2010-03-04 | HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2010-03-03 | HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2010-03-03 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-10 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-02-09 | Referred: Health Care Policy (H) | |
2010-01-07 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-06 | Read First Time (H) | |
2009-12-15 | Prefiled (H) |