MO HB1371 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - Referred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments(H)
Pending: House Select Committee on State and Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - Referred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments(H)
Pending: House Select Committee on State and Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies motorcycle helmet law
Title
Modifies motorcycle helmet law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-17 | House | Referred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments(H) |
2016-02-17 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-15 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-08 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-28 | House | Referred: Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1371&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB1371I.PDF |