MO HB137 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Changes provisions related to funding for charter schools

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes provisions related to funding for charter schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2021-02-22HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-02-22HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-02-17HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2021-02-17HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 15 NOES: 13 PRESENT: 0
2021-02-09HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2021-02-09HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-01-26HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2021-01-14HouseReferred: Budget(H)
2021-01-07HouseRead Second Time (H)
2021-01-06HouseRead First Time (H)
2020-12-01HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback