MO HB1367 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-19 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Emerging Issues in Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-19 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Emerging Issues in Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires review by the General Assembly or committees of the General Assembly of various proposed actions by the Department of Elementary and Secondary Education
Title
Requires review by the General Assembly or committees of the General Assembly of various proposed actions by the Department of Elementary and Secondary Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred: Emerging Issues in Education(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1367&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB1367I.PDF |