MO HB1362 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-28 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-28 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the sending of unsolicited absentee ballot request forms
Title
Prohibits the sending of unsolicited absentee ballot request forms
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-27 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-04-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-04-22 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2021-04-22 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-21 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-04-21 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-04-14 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H) |
2021-03-02 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-03-01 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |