MO HB1346 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - Referred: Corrections and Public Institutions(H)
Pending: House Corrections and Public Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - Referred: Corrections and Public Institutions(H)
Pending: House Corrections and Public Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires school districts to display "In God We Trust" in prominent locations in all schools.
Title
Requires school districts to display "In God We Trust" in prominent locations in all schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Baker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | House | Referred: Corrections and Public Institutions(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1346&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/3788H.01I.pdf |