MO HB133 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-13 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-13 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the accreditation requirements for reinsurance companies and specifies when an insurance company can take credit or reduce liability due to reinsurance
Title
Changes the laws regarding the accreditation requirements for reinsurance companies and specifies when an insurance company can take credit or reduce liability due to reinsurance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-13 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 34 |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - TUESDAY, APRIL 9, 2013, 12:00PM, SCR 1 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Small Business, Insurance, and Industry(S) |
2013-03-27 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2013-03-27 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 145 PRESENT: 1 |
2013-03-27 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2013-03-06 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2013-02-25 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2013-02-25 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2013-02-25 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-02-18 | House | Rules - No Action Taken (H) |
2013-02-18 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2013-02-06 | House | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) |
2013-02-04 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2013-02-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-02-04 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred: Insurance Policy(H) |
2013-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-01-09 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
2013-01-09 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |