MO HB131 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-11 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits an employer from requiring a person to become a member of a labor organization as a condition or continuation of employment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits an employer from requiring a person to become a member of a labor organization as a condition or continuation of employment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-11HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H)
2017-01-11HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2017-01-11HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-01-10HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2017-01-05HouseReferred: Economic Development(H)
2017-01-05HouseRead Second Time (H)
2017-01-04HouseRead First Time (H)
2016-12-05HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback