MO HB1306 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Designates the "Police Officer Michael V Langsdorf Memorial Bridge" in St. Louis County

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates the "Police Officer Michael V Langsdorf Memorial Bridge" in St. Louis County

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-14HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2021-04-13HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-04-13HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-04-01HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2021-04-01HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2021-03-31HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-03-31HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-03-24HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2021-03-04HouseReferred: Transportation(H)
2021-02-25HouseRead Second Time (H)
2021-02-24HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback