MO HB13 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates money for real property leases and related services
Title
Appropriates money for real property leases and related services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-23 - House - HB 13 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 134 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - HB 13 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 134 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - HB 13 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 131 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - HB 13 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 134 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - HB 13 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 131 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-11 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 30 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report (S) - AYES: 30 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Senate Submits Conference Committee Report (S) |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2015-04-23 | Senate | House Message (H) |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 134 NOES: 15 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | House Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 134 NOES: 15 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2015-04-22 | Senate | House Distributes Conference Committee Report (H) |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Conference Committee Hearing - Wednesday, April 22 - Hearing Room 3 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | House Message (H) |
2015-04-08 | Senate | House Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES FLANIGAN, FITZPATRICK, ROSS, LAFAVER, MCCANN BEATTY |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - SCHAEFER, BROWN, SILVEY, CURLS, WALSH |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S) |
2015-04-08 | House | Reported to The Senate (S) |
2015-04-08 | House | House Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference - SCS |
2015-04-08 | House | Taken Up |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 33 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2015-04-06 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Public Hearing Continued (S) - Thursday, April 2, 2015, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2, Marik-up |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Public Hearing Continued (S) - Wednesday, April 1, 2015, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2, Mark-up |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Public Hearing Continued (S) - Tuesday, March 31, 2015, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Public Hearing Continued (S) - Monday, March 30, 2015, 12:30pm, Senate Committee Room 2 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) - Thursday, March 19, 2015, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, March 18, 2015, 30 Minutes Upon Morning Recess, Senate Committee Room 2 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, March 19, 2015, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, March 18, 2015, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thirty minutes (30) upon morning recess. Senate Committee Room 2 |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Appropriations(S) |
2015-03-12 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-03-12 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 131 NOES: 16 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-12 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-03-10 | House | Perfected (H) |
2015-03-10 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2015-03-10 | House | Taken Up |
2015-03-10 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2015-03-10 | House | Taken Up |
2015-03-10 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2015-03-10 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-03-05 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass with Time Limit (H) - Do Pass with a time limit of six hours total debate on perfection. |
2015-03-05 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass with Time Limit (H) |
2015-03-05 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Rules(H) |
2015-03-04 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2015-03-03 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-03-03 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-17 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Budget(H) |
2015-02-17 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1, HCA 2 AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-02-12 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2015-02-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-01-29 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred: Appropriations - General Administration(H) |
2015-02-02 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |