MO HB128 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-14 - Referred: Emerging Issues(H)
Pending: House Emerging Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-14 - Referred: Emerging Issues(H)
Pending: House Emerging Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding tort liability associated with the concealed carry of firearms
Title
Changes the laws regarding tort liability associated with the concealed carry of firearms
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | House | Referred: Emerging Issues(H) |
2015-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-07 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2014-12-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB128&year=2015&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills151/billpdf/intro/HB0128I.PDF |