MO HB1272 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-06 - Referred: Rules(H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-06 - Referred: Rules(H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the City of Florissant to charge a reasonable fee to pay for costs associated with the maintenance of right-of-ways and easements
Title
Authorizes the City of Florissant to charge a reasonable fee to pay for costs associated with the maintenance of right-of-ways and easements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-06 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-02-06 | House | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) |
2014-02-06 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-02-06 | House | Committee Vote to Reconsider (H) - committee voted to reconsider consent vote. |
2014-02-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-01-30 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-01-30 | House | Motion to Do Pass Failed (H) - motion to do pass by consent failed. |
2014-01-30 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-01-23 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-16 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2014-01-13 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1272&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HB1272I.htm |